KS HB2269 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 10, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 10, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Kansas cigarette and tobacco products act to raise the minimum age to 21 years old for the sale, purchase or possession of cigarettes, electronic cigarettes or tobacco products.
Title
Amending the Kansas cigarette and tobacco products act to raise the minimum age to 21 years old for the sale, purchase or possession of cigarettes, electronic cigarettes or tobacco products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 28 Nay: 11 (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 68 Nay: 53 (Y: 68 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 68 Nay: 53 (Y: 68 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | House | House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 10, 2023 |
2023-04-03 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, April 3, 2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 28 Nay: 11 |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 22, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2023-03-02 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 68 Nay: 53 |
2023-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2023-03-02 | House | House Representative Kessler raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2023-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Donohoe |
2023-02-16 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2023-02-09 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 9, 2023, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2023-02-02 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2023-02-02 | House | House Introduced |