KS HB2219 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the Kansas targeted employment act to provide tax credits for the employment of persons with developmental disabilities.
Title
Enacting the Kansas targeted employment act to provide tax credits for the employment of persons with developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 1 (Y: 123 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died on Senate General Orders |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 16, 2022, 10:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-03-16 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 1 |
2021-03-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-03-12 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2021-03-10 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2021-03-05 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-16 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 16, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 346-S |
2021-02-03 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2021-02-03 | House | House Introduced |