KS HB2206 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Updating certain definitions, referral to specialty services and coordination of care provisions in the Kansas telemedicine act.
Title
Updating certain definitions, referral to specialty services and coordination of care provisions in the Kansas telemedicine act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Health and Human Services; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-09 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 9, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 112-N |
2021-02-09 | House | House Hearing: (proponents) Tuesday, February 9, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 112-N |
2021-02-09 | House | House Hearing: (neutral) Tuesday, February 9, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 112-N |
2021-02-03 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2021-02-03 | House | House Introduced |