KS HB2157 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing restrictions on the use of step therapy protocols by health insurance plans.
Title
Establishing restrictions on the use of step therapy protocols by health insurance plans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2021-02-03 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 3, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 112-N |
2021-01-27 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2021-01-27 | House | House Introduced |