KS HB2128 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying jurisdiction and supervision of offenders in a certified drug abuse treatment program.
Title
Clarifying jurisdiction and supervision of offenders in a certified drug abuse treatment program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 24, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-03-02 | House | House Engrossed on Monday, March 1, 2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2021-03-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-02-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2021-02-01 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 1, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2021-01-25 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2021-01-25 | House | House Introduced |