KS HB2128 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, June 2, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, June 2, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amending provisions concerning annual examinations, transitional and conditional release of sexually violent predators.
Title
Amending provisions concerning annual examinations, transitional and conditional release of sexually violent predators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 116 Nay: 0 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 104 Nay: 21 (Y: 104 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 104 Nay: 21 (Y: 104 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | House | House Approved by Governor on Friday, June 2, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-22 | House | House Engrossed on Monday, May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-22 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 116 Nay: 0 |
2017-05-22 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Senator Baumgardner is appointed to replace Senator Lynn on the Conference Committee |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Wilborn, Senator Lynn and Senator Haley appointed as conferees |
2017-04-03 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Finch , Representative Patton and Representative Carmichael as conferees |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 16, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-02-22 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 104 Nay: 21 |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-02-13 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-07 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 07, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 112-N |
2017-01-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-23 | House | House Introduced |