KS HB2109 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 14, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 14, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the disclosure of personal information about a person's affiliation with an entity that is exempt from federal income taxation under section 501(c) of the federal internal revenue code and continuing in existence certain exceptions to the disclosure of public records under the open records act.
Title
Prohibiting the disclosure of personal information about a person's affiliation with an entity that is exempt from federal income taxation under section 501(c) of the federal internal revenue code and continuing in existence certain exceptions to the disclosure of public records under the open records act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 92 Nay: 20 (Y: 92 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 35 Nay: 5 (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 87 Nay: 36 (Y: 87 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 35 Nay: 5 (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 87 Nay: 36 (Y: 87 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 14, 2022 |
2022-04-25 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 8, 2022 |
2022-04-25 | House | House Engrossed on Sunday, April 3, 2022 |
2022-04-01 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 92 Nay: 20 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Warren, Senator Wilborn and Senator Haley appointed as conferees |
2022-03-21 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Patton , Representative Ralph and Representative Carmichael as conferees |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 35 Nay: 5 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 22, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-02-11 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 87 Nay: 36 |
2021-02-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-02-08 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-26 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 26, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-01-21 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-21 | House | House Introduced |