KS HB2084 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing for sharing data and information between state agencies and Kansas sentencing commission.
Title
Allowing for sharing data and information between state agencies and Kansas sentencing commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 14, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-02-13 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2017-02-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-01-31 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2017-01-24 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 24, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 152-S |
2017-01-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2017-01-18 | House | House Introduced |