KS HB2064 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying that a law enforcement officer taking a person before a judge for violating the uniform act regulating traffic does not make charging decisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifying that a law enforcement officer taking a person before a judge for violating the uniform act regulating traffic does not make charging decisions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28HouseHouse Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
2019-02-07HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-29HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, January 29, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
2019-01-23HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-23HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback