KS HB2064 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that a law enforcement officer taking a person before a judge for violating the uniform act regulating traffic does not make charging decisions.
Title
Clarifying that a law enforcement officer taking a person before a judge for violating the uniform act regulating traffic does not make charging decisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2019-02-07 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-29 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 29, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2019-01-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-23 | House | House Introduced |