KS HB2063 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an opportunity for diversion in certain circumstances.
Title
Requiring an opportunity for diversion in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 31, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 112-N |
2017-01-17 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-17 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2063/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2063_00_0000.pdf |