KS HB2053 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, May 24, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, May 24, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2053 by Committee on Judiciary - Enacting the crisis intervention act.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2053 by Committee on Judiciary - Enacting the crisis intervention act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 27 Nay: 12 (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 27 Nay: 12 (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | House | House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, May 24, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 120 Nay: 0 |
2017-05-15 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Wilborn, Senator Lynn and Senator Haley appointed as conferees |
2017-04-03 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Finch , Representative Patton and Representative Carmichael as conferees |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 27 Nay: 12 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 16, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-02-08 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2017-02-08 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, February 7, 2017 |
2017-02-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-02-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-01-30 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-17 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 17, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 112-N |
2017-01-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-12 | House | House Introduced |