KS HB2047 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Peck, Senator McGinn and Senator Ware appointed as conferees
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Peck, Senator McGinn and Senator Ware appointed as conferees
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2047 by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources - Prohibiting entering or remaining on and knowingly making false statements to gain access to animal facilities and field crop production areas, providing penalties therefor and removing the intent to destroy property in the farm animal and field crop and research facilities protection act.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2047 by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources - Prohibiting entering or remaining on and knowingly making false statements to gain access to animal facilities and field crop production areas, providing penalties therefor and removing the intent to destroy property in the farm animal and field crop and research facilities protection act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 2 (Y: 120 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 2 (Y: 120 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Peck, Senator McGinn and Senator Ware appointed as conferees |
2024-04-01 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Rahjes , Representative Moser and Representative Carlin as conferees |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2023-02-23 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, February 23, 2023 |
2023-02-23 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 120 Nay: 2 |
2023-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2023-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2023-02-16 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2023-02-13 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 13, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2023-01-20 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Water; Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2023-01-17 | House | House Referred to Committee on Water |
2023-01-17 | House | House Introduced |