KS HB2026 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, May 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, May 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a drug abuse treatment program for people on diversion and allowing county and district attorneys to enter into agreements with chief judges and community corrections for supervision, clarifying jurisdiction and supervision of offenders in a certified drug abuse treatment program, authorizing the Kansas sentencing commission to change risk assessment cut-off levels for participation in the certified drug abuse treatment program, modifying the criminal penalties for tampering with electronic monitoring equipment and increasing the criminal penalties for riot and incitement to riot in a correctional facility.
Title
Creating a drug abuse treatment program for people on diversion and allowing county and district attorneys to enter into agreements with chief judges and community corrections for supervision, clarifying jurisdiction and supervision of offenders in a certified drug abuse treatment program, authorizing the Kansas sentencing commission to change risk assessment cut-off levels for participation in the certified drug abuse treatment program, modifying the criminal penalties for tampering with electronic monitoring equipment and increasing the criminal penalties for riot and incitement to riot in a correctional facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 36 Nay: 0 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 36 Nay: 0 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | House | House Approved by Governor on Friday, May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, May 5, 2021 |
2021-05-05 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 121 Nay: 0 |
2021-05-05 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 36 Nay: 0 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Warren, Senator Wilborn and Senator Haley appointed as conferees |
2021-03-30 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Jennings , Representative Owens and Representative Highberger as conferees |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 10, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-01-28 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2021-01-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-01-27 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2021-01-20 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 20, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2021-01-11 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2021-01-11 | House | House Introduced |
2021-01-11 | House | House Prefiled for Introduction on Thursday, December 31, 2020 |