KS HB2025 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - House Committee of the Whole - Motion to recommend favorably for passage failed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Protecting private property from unauthorized access by certain government officials and unauthorized surveillance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting private property from unauthorized access by certain government officials and unauthorized surveillance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to recommend favorably for passage failed
2021-03-29HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2021-03-24HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2021-03-15HouseHouse Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2021-03-01HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2021-02-04HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, February 4, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
2021-01-21HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Agriculture; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2021-01-11HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Agriculture
2021-01-11HouseHouse Introduced
2021-01-11HouseHouse Prefiled for Introduction on Thursday, December 31, 2020

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback