KS HB2009 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removing sodomy between consenting members of the same sex from criminal sodomy.
Title
Removing sodomy between consenting members of the same sex from criminal sodomy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2021-01-15 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2021-01-11 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-11 | House | House Introduced |
2021-01-11 | House | House Prefiled for Introduction on Tuesday, December 22, 2020 |