KS H2627 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
School districts; consolidation of three or more districts into two districts. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
School districts; consolidation of three or more districts into two districts. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2010-02-23 | Hearing: Thurs., 2/25/2010, 9:00 AM, Rm 711 Docking | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to Education -HJ 873 | |
2010-02-03 | Introduced -HJ 860 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |