KS H2554 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-17 - Approved by gov.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-17 - Approved by gov.
Summary
Authorizing the issuance of bonds for certain economic development projects. Effective date: July 1, 2010.
Title
Authorizing the issuance of bonds for certain economic development projects. Effective date: July 1, 2010.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-17 | Approved by gov. | |
2010-05-11 | Enrolled and presented to gov. -HJ 1838 | |
2010-05-07 | Adptd CCR on house bill; Yeas 109 Nays 12 -HJ 1539; Engrossed -HJ 1772 | |
2010-05-06 | Not subject to limitations of joint rule 4(k) -SJ 1473; Adptd CCR; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 1479 | |
2010-04-30 | Acceded; 2nd CC apptd Brownlee, Lynn, Holland -SJ 1389 | |
2010-04-29 | Not subject to limitations of joint rule 4(k) -HJ 1394; Rejected CCR; 2nd CC requested; apptd Gordon, Donohoe, Benlon -HJ 1394 | |
2010-03-30 | Acceded; apptd Brownlee, Lynn, Holland -SJ 1304; Adptd CCR; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 1348 | |
2010-03-30 | Adverse action reconsidered -HJ 1316; Nonconcurred; CC requested; apptd Gordon, Donohoe, Benlon -HJ 1316 | |
2010-03-29 | Motion to concur failed; Yeas 57 Nays 63 -HJ 1308 | |
2010-03-24 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -SJ 1260; EFA: Passed as am.; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 1262 | |
2010-03-17 | CR: Be passed as am. by Commerce -SJ 1207 | |
2010-02-16 | Referred to Commerce -SJ 1028 | |
2010-02-15 | Received and introduced -SJ 1025 | |
2010-02-12 | FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 98 Nays 15 -HJ 918 | |
2010-02-11 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -HJ 913; Engrossed -HJ 921 | |
2010-02-04 | CR: Be passed as am. by Economic Development and Tourism -HJ 877 | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to Economic Development and Tourism -HJ 842 | |
2010-01-27 | Introduced -HJ 836; Hearing: Wed., 2/3/2010, 3:30PM, Rm 152-S |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |