KS H2299 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in Senate committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in Senate committee
Summary
Sales taxation; relating to exemptions. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Sales taxation; relating to exemptions. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in Senate committee | |
2010-01-20 | Withdrawn from Transportation -SJ 932; Rereferred to Assessment and Taxation -SJ 932 | |
2009-05-06 | Withdrawn from Assessment and Taxation -SJ 816; Referred to Transportation -SJ 816 | |
2009-03-23 | COW: CR be adptd; be further am.; be passed as am. -SJ 471; Motion to refer back to Committee -SJ 472; Be rereferred to Assessment and Taxation -SJ 472 | |
2009-03-20 | CR: Be passed as am. by Assessment and Taxation -SJ 404 | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Assessment and Taxation -SJ 340 | |
2009-03-17 | Received and introduced -SJ 337 | |
2009-03-17 | FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 104 Nays 18 -HJ 305 | |
2009-03-16 | COW: CR be adptd; be further am.; be passed as am. -HJ 301 | |
2009-03-05 | CR: Be passed as am. by Taxation -HJ 258 | |
2009-02-11 | Hearing: Tues., 2/17/09, 9:00AM, Rm.535-N | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Taxation -HJ 135 | |
2009-02-05 | Introduced -HJ 131 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |