KS H2142 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-26 - Approved by gov. -HJ 442
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-26 - Approved by gov. -HJ 442
Summary
Cities; continuing education requirements for plumbers, electricians and certain mechanical contractors. Effective date: July 1, 2009.
Title
Cities; continuing education requirements for plumbers, electricians and certain mechanical contractors. Effective date: July 1, 2009.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-26 | Approved by gov. -HJ 442 | |
2009-03-17 | Enrolled and presented to gov. -HJ 312 | |
2009-03-11 | FA: Passed; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 295 | |
2009-03-10 | COW: Be passed -SJ 291 | |
2009-03-05 | CR: Be passed by Commerce -SJ 268 | |
2009-02-25 | Referred to Commerce -SJ 240 | |
2009-02-24 | Received and introduced -SJ 238 | |
2009-02-20 | FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 117 Nays 2 -HJ 208; Engrossed -HJ 224 | |
2009-02-19 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -HJ 204 | |
2009-02-17 | CR: Be passed as am. by Commerce and Labor -HJ 177 | |
2009-02-04 | Hearing: Tues.,2/10/09, 9:00AM, Rm 784 Docking | |
2009-01-29 | Referred to Commerce and Labor -HJ 78 | |
2009-01-28 | Introduced -HJ 75 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |