KS H2003 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-27 - Approved by gov. -HJ 442
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-27 - Approved by gov. -HJ 442
Summary
Career technical education; funding formula; update in terminology. Effective date: July 1, 2009.
Title
Career technical education; funding formula; update in terminology. Effective date: July 1, 2009.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-27 | Approved by gov. -HJ 442 | |
2009-03-20 | Enrolled and presented to gov. -HJ 364 | |
2009-03-12 | COW: Be passed -SJ 311; EFA: Passed; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 313 | |
2009-03-10 | CR: Be passed by Education -SJ 290 | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Education -SJ 198 | |
2009-02-17 | Received and introduced -SJ 190 | |
2009-02-17 | FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 125 Nays 0 -HJ 174 | |
2009-02-16 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -HJ 169; Engrossed -HJ 180 | |
2009-02-11 | CR: Be passed as am. by Higher Education -HJ 151 | |
2009-02-05 | Hearing: Hearing: Mon., 2/09/09, 1:30 p.m., Rm. DSOB 786 | |
2009-01-29 | Hearing: Wed., 2/4/09, 1:30 PM, Rm 786 Docking | |
2009-01-21 | Hearing: Tues., 1/27/09, 1:30 pm, Rm 786 Docking | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced -HJ 14; Referred to Higher Education -HJ 15 | |
2009-01-06 | Prefiled for introduction |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |