IN SR0056 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-08 - Senator Banks added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-08 - Senator Banks added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Study committee on the use of tax increment financing.
Title
Study committee on the use of tax increment financing.
Sponsors
Rep. Milo Smith [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Howard Kenley [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Doug Eckerty [R] | Sen. Carlin Yoder [R] | Sen. James Banks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senator Banks added as coauthor |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senators Eckerty and Yoder added as coauthors |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Senators Buck and Kenley added as coauthors |
2013-03-28 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Authored by Senator Smith |