IN SR0050 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Second reading: adopted voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Second reading: adopted voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Study committee on water resource management unification in Indiana.
Title
Study committee on water resource management unification in Indiana.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senators Glick and Randolph added as coauthors |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2013-03-19 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Authored by Senator R. Young |