IN SR0041 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Second reading: adopted voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Second reading: adopted voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A SENATE RESOLUTION urging the legislative council to assign to the appropriate study committee issues related to educational support professionals.
Title
A SENATE RESOLUTION urging the legislative council to assign to the appropriate study committee issues related to educational support professionals.
Sponsors
Sen. Rodney Pol [D] | Sen. Linda Rogers [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as second author |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-02-15 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pol |