IN SR0036 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Second reading: adopted voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Second reading: adopted voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A SENATE RESOLUTION urging the legislative council to assign to the appropriate study committee the topic of Medicaid coverage for patients in need of specialty care, permitting more access to out-of-state and out-of-network resources.
Title
A SENATE RESOLUTION urging the legislative council to assign to the appropriate study committee the topic of Medicaid coverage for patients in need of specialty care, permitting more access to out-of-state and out-of-network resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senator Ruckelshaus added as coauthor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-03-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Melton |