IN SR0029 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Second reading: adopted voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Second reading: adopted voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A SENATE RESOLUTION urging the legislative council to assign to the appropriate study committee the topic of a direct primary care pilot program for Indiana Medicaid and Healthy Indiana Plan (HIP) participants.
Title
A SENATE RESOLUTION urging the legislative council to assign to the appropriate study committee the topic of a direct primary care pilot program for Indiana Medicaid and Healthy Indiana Plan (HIP) participants.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Mark Stoops [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-20 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Authored by Senator Koch |