IN SR0029 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Senator Buck added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Senator Buck added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A SENATE RESOLUTION affirming support for the U.S. state-based system of insurance regulation in response to recent federal encroachment.
Title
A SENATE RESOLUTION affirming support for the U.S. state-based system of insurance regulation in response to recent federal encroachment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senator Buck added as coauthor |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as coauthor |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-02-21 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holdman |