IN SR0024 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senator Charbonneau added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senator Charbonneau added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A SENATE RESOLUTION supporting Taiwan's signing of a Bilateral Trade Agreement with the United States, reaffirming support for increasing Taiwan's international profile and for strengthening ties between Indiana and Taiwan.
Title
A SENATE RESOLUTION supporting Taiwan's signing of a Bilateral Trade Agreement with the United States, reaffirming support for increasing Taiwan's international profile and for strengthening ties between Indiana and Taiwan.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Rodric Bray [R] |
Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as coauthor |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senator Buck added as coauthor |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senator Bray added as coauthor |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senators Young M and Ford Jon |