IN SJR0019 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the total amount of expense appropriations enacted by the general assembly for a biennial budget may not exceed the estimated revenue of the state in the biennial budget period. Defines "revenue" as all income received by the state general fund and all other state funds, excluding the proceeds of bonds or other loans. Defines "expense" as the ordinary operating costs of state government, including any debt service payments made during the biennial budget period. Provides that a state budget enacted by the general assembly must appropriate money for the state's prefunded pension funds in the amount necessary to
Title
Provides that the total amount of expense appropriations enacted by the general assembly for a biennial budget may not exceed the estimated revenue of the state in the biennial budget period. Defines "revenue" as all income received by the state general fund and all other state funds, excluding the proceeds of bonds or other loans. Defines "expense" as the ordinary operating costs of state government, including any debt service payments made during the biennial budget period. Provides that a state budget enacted by the general assembly must appropriate money for the state's prefunded pension funds in the amount necessary to
Sponsors
Sen. Brandt Hershman [R] | Sen. Howard Kenley [R] | Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] |
Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Patricia Miller [R] | Rep. Timothy Brown [R] |
Rep. Todd Huston [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - House - House Floor - (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Floor - (Y: 83 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Floor - (Y: 26 N: 68 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-04-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Floor - (Y: 83 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Floor - (Y: 26 N: 68 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-04-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
No history available at this time. |