IN SJR0003 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-31 - Senator Crane added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-31 - Senator Crane added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Congress to call a constitutional convention under Article 5 of the Constitution of the United States for the purpose of proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States to fix the membership of the United States Supreme Court at nine justices.
Title
Directs Congress to call a constitutional convention under Article 5 of the Constitution of the United States for the purpose of proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States to fix the membership of the United States Supreme Court at nine justices.
Sponsors
Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] |
Sen. John Crane [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senator Crane added as coauthor |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Senator Koch added as coauthor |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as third author |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Senator Young M added as second author |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Buck |