IN SCR0045 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-14)
Status: Passed on March 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Returned to the Senate with amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-14)
Status: Passed on March 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Returned to the Senate with amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION honoring Dr. Jo Ann Gora upon her retirement as President of Ball State University
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION honoring Dr. Jo Ann Gora upon her retirement as President of Ball State University
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - House - House Floor - (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Committee on Elections and Apportionment - Roll Call 020702 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Committee on Elections - Roll Call 020701 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Committee on Elections and Apportionment - Roll Call 020702 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Committee on Elections - Roll Call 020701 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2014-03-06 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Representative Lutz added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Representative Errington added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Representative Mahan added first sponsor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Zakas added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator M. Young added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator R. Young added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Wyss added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Waterman added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Waltz added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Walker added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Steele added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Smith added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Skinner added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Schneider added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Paul added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Nugent added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Mishler added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Pat Miller added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Pete Miller added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Long added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Leising added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Landske added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Kenley added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Hume added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Head added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Glick added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Eckerty added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Delph added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Crider added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Buck added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Broden added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Bray added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Boots added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Becker added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Banks added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Alting added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Lanane. |