IN SCR0034 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-27 - First reading: referred to the Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-27 - First reading: referred to the Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Directing the ISP to study Rapid DNA. A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION directing the Indiana State Police to study Rapid Deoxyribonucleic Acid (DNA) and provide a report with findings and recommendations to the Legislative Council before December 15, 2023.
Title
Directing the ISP to study Rapid DNA.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Blake Doriot [R] |
Sen. James Tomes [R] | Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-27 | House | First reading: referred to the Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2023-04-13 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative McNamara |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Senators Doriot and Tomes added as coauthors |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Senator Buck added as third author |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-03-23 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Authored by Senators Crider and Charbonneau |