IN SCR0030 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the legislative council to assign to the appropriate committee the topic of redistricting issues.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the legislative council to assign to the appropriate committee the topic of redistricting issues.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. James Merritt [R] | Sen. Michael Delph [R] |
Rep. Kathy Richardson [R] | Rep. Milo Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | House | Returned to the Senate |
2018-02-12 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senators Merritt and Delph added as coauthors |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Smith, M. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Richardson |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Authored by Senator Walker |