IN SCR0019 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Study committee on current oversight structure applicable to IPFW.
Title
Study committee on current oversight structure applicable to IPFW.
Sponsors
Sen. James Banks [R] | Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] |
Sen. Thomas Wyss [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | Returned to the Senate | |
2012-03-05 | First reading: adopted voice vote | |
2012-02-28 | House sponsor: Rep. Espich | |
2012-02-28 | Referred to the House | |
2012-02-28 | Second reading: adopted voice vote | |
2012-02-23 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-20 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development | |
2012-02-20 | Coauthored by Senators Holdman and Glick | |
2012-02-20 | Authored by Senators Banks, Kruse and Wyss |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2012&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SCR&docno=0019 |
Text | http://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/SRESF/SC0019.html |