IN SCR0014 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 42-10)
Status: Passed on February 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Representative Lauer added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 42-10)
Status: Passed on February 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Representative Lauer added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Honoring the Indiana Fever and recognizing National Girls and Women in Sports Day. A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION honoring the Indiana Fever and recognizing the 37th annual National Girls and Women in Sports Day.
Title
Honoring the Indiana Fever and recognizing National Girls and Women in Sports Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | House | Representative Lauer added as cosponsor |
2023-02-15 | House | Returned to the Senate |
2023-02-14 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Senators Alexander, Alting, Baldwin, Bassler, Becker, Bohacek, Bray, Breaux, Brown L, Buchanan, Buck, Busch, Byrne, Charbonneau, Crane, Crider, Deery, Dernulc, Donato, Doriot, Ford J.D., Ford Jon, Freeman, Garten, Gaskill, Glick, Holdman, Hunley, Johnson, Koch, Leising, Melton, Messmer, Mishler, Niemeyer, Niezgodski, Perfect, Pol, Qaddoura, Raatz, Randolph, Rogers, Sandlin, Taylor G, Tomes, Walker G, Yoder, Young M, Zay added as coauthors |
2023-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative McNamara |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Walker K |
Subjects
RESOLUTIONS, _Birthdays, Anniversaries, and Special Events Celebrated
RESOLUTIONS, _Groups, Organizations, and Companies Congratulated
RESOLUTIONS, _Groups, Organizations, and Companies Congratulated
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2023/resolutions/senate/concurrent/14 |
Text | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2023/resolutions/senate/concurrent/14#1.INTR |