IN SCR0014 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 106-37)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION honoring Indiana Secretary of State Connie Lawson upon her retirement from the Office of the Indiana Secretary of State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION honoring Indiana Secretary of State Connie Lawson upon her retirement from the Office of the Indiana Secretary of State.

Sponsors

Sen. Rodric Bray [R]Sen. Ronnie Alting [R]Sen. Scott Baldwin [R]Sen. Eric Bassler [R]
Sen. Vaneta Becker [R]Sen. Mike Bohacek [R]Sen. Philip Boots [R]Sen. Jean Breaux [D]
Sen. Elizabeth Brown [R]Sen. Brian Buchanan [R]Sen. James Buck [R]Sen. Justin Busch [R]
Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R]Sen. John Crane [R]Sen. Michael Crider [R]Sen. Stacey Donato [R]
Sen. Blake Doriot [R]Sen. J.D. Ford [D]Sen. Jon Ford [R]Sen. Aaron Freeman [R]
Sen. Chris Garten [R]Sen. Mike Gaskill [R]Sen. Susan Glick [R]Sen. Ronald Grooms [R]
Sen. Travis Holdman [R]Sen. Erin Houchin [R]Sen. Eric Koch [R]Sen. Dennis Kruse [R]
Sen. Timothy Lanane [D]Sen. Jean Leising [R]Sen. Eddie Melton [D]Sen. Mark Messmer [R]
Sen. Ryan Mishler [R]Sen. Frank Mrvan [D]Sen. Rick Niemeyer [R]Sen. David Niezgodski [D]
Sen. Clyde Perfect [R]Sen. Fady Qaddoura [D]Sen. Jeff Raatz [R]Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D]
Sen. Linda Rogers [R]Sen. Jack Sandlin [R]Sen. Karen Tallian [D]Sen. Greg Taylor [D]
Sen. James Tomes [R]Sen. Greg Walker [R]Sen. Kyle Walker [R]Sen. Shelli Yoder [D]
Sen. Michael Young [R]Sen. Andy Zay [R]Rep. Todd Huston [R]Rep. David Abbott [R]
Rep. Micheal Aylesworth [R]Rep. Beau Baird [R]Rep. Bradford Barrett [R]Rep. Steve Bartels [R]
Rep. Robert Behning [R]Rep. Bruce Borders [R]Rep. Timothy Brown [R]Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R]
Rep. Robert Cherry [R]Rep. Edward Clere [R]Rep. Anthony Cook [R]Rep. Michelle Davis [R]
Rep. Dale DeVon [R]Rep. Sean Eberhart [R]Rep. Jeff Ellington [R]Rep. Karen Engleman [R]
Rep. Randall Frye [R]Rep. Chuck Goodrich [R]Rep. Doug Gutwein [R]Rep. Robert Heaton [R]
Rep. Dave Heine [R]Rep. Matt Hostettler [R]Rep. Jack Jordan [R]Rep. Christopher Judy [R]
Rep. Michael Karickhoff [R]Rep. Joanna King [R]Rep. Ryan Lauer [R]Rep. Cindy Ledbetter [R]
Rep. Donald Lehe [R]Rep. Matthew Lehman [R]Rep. Daniel Leonard [R]Rep. Shane Lindauer [R]
Rep. Jim Lucas [R]Rep. Randy Lyness [R]Rep. Ethan Manning [R]Rep. Chris May [R]
Rep. Peggy Mayfield [R]Rep. Wendy McNamara [R]Rep. Doug Miller [R]Rep. Robert Morris [R]
Rep. Alan Morrison [R]Rep. Sharon Negele [R]Rep. Curt Nisly [R]Rep. Julie Olthoff [R]
Rep. Zach Payne [R]Rep. John Prescott [R]Rep. Jim Pressel [R]Rep. Elizabeth Rowray [R]
Rep. Thomas Saunders [R]Rep. Donna Schaibley [R]Rep. Harold Slager [R]Rep. Ben Smaltz [R]
Rep. Craig Snow [R]Rep. Edmond Soliday [R]Rep. Mike Speedy [R]Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R]
Rep. Jake Teshka [R]Rep. Jeffrey Thompson [R]Rep. Gerald Torr [R]Rep. Heath VanNatter [R]
Rep. Ann Vermilion [R]Rep. Timothy Wesco [R]Rep. John Young [R]Rep. Dennis Zent [R]
Rep. Cindy Ziemke [R]Rep. Mike Andrade [D]Rep. Terri Jo Austin [D]Rep. John Bartlett [D]
Rep. Maureen Bauer [D]Rep. Pat Boy [D]Rep. Chris Campbell [D]Rep. Edward DeLaney [D]
Rep. Sue Errington [D]Rep. Rita Fleming [D]Rep. Philip GiaQuinta [D]Rep. Mitch Gore [D]
Rep. Carey Hamilton [D]Rep. Earl Harris [D]Rep. Ragen Hatcher [D]Rep. Carolyn Jackson [D]
Rep. Blake Johnson [D]Rep. Sheila Klinker [D]Rep. Charles Moseley [D]Rep. Renee Pack [D]
Rep. Tonya Pfaff [D]Rep. Matt Pierce [D]Rep. Gregory Porter [D]Rep. Cherrish Pryor [D]
Rep. Robin Shackleford [D]Rep. Vernon Smith [D]Rep. Vanessa Summers [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31HouseReturned to the Senate
2021-03-30HouseRepresentatives Andrade M, Austin, Bartlett, Bauer M, Boy, Campbell, DeLaney, Errington, Fleming, GiaQuinta, Gore M, Hamilton, Harris, Hatcher, Jackson, Johnson, Klinker, Moseley, Pack R, Pfaff, Pierce, Porter, Pryor, Shackleford, Smith, V., Summers added as cosponsors
2021-03-25HouseRepresentatives Abbott D, Aylesworth, Baird, Barrett, Bartels, Behning, Borders, Brown, T., Carbaugh, Cherry, Clere, Cook, Davis M, DeVon, Eberhart, Ellington, Engleman, Frye, Goodrich, Gutwein, Heaton, Heine, Hostettler, Jordan, Judy, Karickhoff, King J, Lauer, Ledbetter C, Lehe, Lehman, Leonard, Lindauer, Lucas, Lyness, Manning, May, Mayfield, McNamara, Miller, Morris, Morrison, Negele, Nisly, Olthoff, Payne Z, Prescott, Pressel, Rowray E, Saunders, Schaibley, Slager, Smaltz, Snow C, Soliday, Speedy, Steuerwald, Teshka J, Thompson, Torr, VanNatter, Vermilion A, Wesco, Young J, Zent, Ziemke added as cosponsors
2021-03-18HouseFirst reading: adopted voice vote
2021-03-16SenateReferred to the House
2021-03-16SenateSenators Alting, Baldwin, Bassler, Becker, Bohacek, Boots, Breaux, Brown L, Buchanan, Buck, Busch, Charbonneau, Crane, Crider, Donato, Doriot, Ford J.D., Ford Jon, Freeman, Garten, Gaskill, Glick, Grooms, Holdman, Houchin, Koch, Kruse, Lanane, Leising, Melton, Messmer, Mishler, Mrvan, Niemeyer, Niezgodski, Perfect, Qaddoura, Raatz, Randolph, Rogers, Sandlin, Tallian, Taylor G, Tomes, Walker G, Walker K, Yoder, Young M, Zay added as coauthors
2021-03-16SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Huston
2021-03-16SenateFirst reading: adopted voice vote
2021-03-16SenateAuthored by Senator Bray

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback