IN SCR0012 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-20 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-20 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Study committee on creation of industrial zone for aviation.
Title
Study committee on creation of industrial zone for aviation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-20 | Returned to the Senate | |
2012-02-20 | First reading: adopted voice vote | |
2012-02-13 | Cosponsors: Reps. Clere, Rhoads, Goodin and Davisson | |
2012-02-13 | House sponsor: Rep. Stemler | |
2012-02-13 | Referred to the House | |
2012-02-13 | Second reading: adopted voice vote | |
2012-02-07 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-30 | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce & Economic Development | |
2012-01-30 | Authored by Senator Grooms |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2012&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SCR&docno=0012 |
Text | http://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/SRESF/SC0012.html |