IN SCR0011 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-02 - Referred to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-02 - Referred to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Urging INDOT to rename the bridge on I-64 in Crawford County the "Dale Workman Memorial Bridge". A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to rename the eastbound bridge on I-64 over the Little Blue River in Crawford County the "Dale Workman Memorial Bridge".
Title
Urging INDOT to rename the bridge on I-64 in Crawford County the "Dale Workman Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Pressel |
2024-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Bartels |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-01-18 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Authored by Senator Messmer |