IN SCR0002 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-20 - First reading: referred to the Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-20 - First reading: referred to the Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION directing the Congress of the United States to propose to the several states an amendment to the United States Constitution concerning the membership of the United States Supreme Court.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION directing the Congress of the United States to propose to the several states an amendment to the United States Constitution concerning the membership of the United States Supreme Court.
Sponsors
Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] |
Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Rep. Gerald Torr [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Second reading (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-20 | House | First reading: referred to the Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senators Bohacek and Freeman added as coauthors |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senator Young M added as third author |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senator Koch added as second author |
2022-01-18 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Torr |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Second reading: adopted Roll Call 15: yeas 37, nays 10 |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Buck |