IN SB0609 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 210
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 210
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Indiana horse racing commission (IHRC) to report on the competitive status of the Indiana horse racing industry as compared to the horse racing industries of other states. Provides that the prohibition on members of the IHRC, employees of the IHRC, racing officials, and their respective spouses wagering on horse racing at racetracks and satellite facilities located in Indiana applies after December 31, 2013. Requires the IHRC to post information concerning complaints and disciplinary actions on the IHRC Internet web site. Specifies the following concerning disciplinary action initiated by stewards and judges: (1) That unless appealed within 15 days, a suspension or civil penalty must be imposed within 180 days of the sanctioned violation. (2) That judges and stewards must prove the violation by the preponderance of the evidence. (3) That the IHRC must conduct a hearing on an appealed sanction as required by the administrative adjudication law. Allows the horse racing commission to reduce the percentage that a permit holder is required to retain from amounts wagered if reducing the amount retained is in the best interests of horse racing in Indiana. Authorizes horse racing associations and racino licensees to negotiate an agreement requiring between 10% and 12% of the licensee's adjusted gross receipts to be used to support the horse racing industry. Provides that accounts, books, and records relating to the distributions are subject to audit by the state board of accounts. Recodifies the requirement that each racino pay $250,000 to the gaming integrity fund. Provides that the racino slot machine wagering tax is imposed on 91.5% of adjusted gross receipts that include amounts used to support the horse racing industry. Makes technical corrections.
Title
Horse racing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-26 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - House - Amendment 5 (Goodin), prevailed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - House - Amendment 5 (Goodin), prevailed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 210 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-26 | House | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 633: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2013-04-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 550: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2013-04-11 | House | House advisors appointed: Davis, Lutz, Goodin and GiaQuinta |
2013-04-11 | House | House conferees appointed: Eberhart and Austin |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Leising, Rogers, Charbonneau and Crider |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate conferee appointed: Kenley and Hume |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2013-03-26 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2013-03-26 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 358: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2013-03-25 | House | Amendment 5 (Goodin), prevailed; Roll Call 322: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2013-03-25 | House | Amendment 4 (Eberhart), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-03-25 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-03-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Cosponsors: Reps. Cherry and Goodin |
2013-02-12 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Eberhart |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 124: yeas 49 and nays 0 |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as coauthor |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senator Leising added as second author |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Amendment 1 (Kenley), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-17 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kenley |