IN SB0603 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 236
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Annexation. Provides that property added to a fire protection district (district) is considered part of the district as of the date that the district was originally established. Provides that provisions of the existing law regarding the following apply to districts established after July 1, 1987 (instead of after June 14, 1987): (1) The effective date of an annexation of property within a district and the date that an annexed area ceases to be a part of the district. (2) A municipality's liability for indebtedness of a district that is annexed. Provides that if property is annexed within a fire district (including a district established after July 1, 1987) that has a total net assessed value of more than $1,000,000,000 on the date the annexation ordinance is adopted, the annexed property: (1) remains a part of the district after the annexation; (2) continues to receive its fire protection services from the district; and (3) shall not be taxed by the municipality for fire protection services. Provides that a special fire fund shall be created for all fire protection services provided by the municipality to property within the boundaries of the municipality that is not within the district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Annexation. Provides that property added to a fire protection district (district) is considered part of the district as of the date that the district was originally established. Provides that provisions of the existing law regarding the following apply to districts established after July 1, 1987 (instead of after June 14, 1987): (1) The effective date of an annexation of property within a district and the date that an annexed area ceases to be a part of the district. (2) A municipality's liability for indebtedness of a district that is annexed. Provides that if property is annexed within a fire district (including a district established after July 1, 1987) that has a total net assessed value of more than $1,000,000,000 on the date the annexation ordinance is adopted, the annexed property: (1) remains a part of the district after the annexation; (2) continues to receive its fire protection services from the district; and (3) shall not be taxed by the municipality for fire protection services. Provides that a special fire fund shall be created for all fire protection services provided by the municipality to property within the boundaries of the municipality that is not within the district.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 2 (Y: 63 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 2 (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Floor - (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-05SenatePublic Law 236
2019-05-05SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-23HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 2: adopted by the House; Roll Call 613: yeas 63, nays 30
2019-04-23SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 2: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 580: yeas 27, nays 21
2019-04-23HouseCCR # 2 filed in the House
2019-04-23SenateCCR # 2 filed in the Senate
2019-04-23SenateMotion to withdraw CCR # 1: prevailed
2019-04-23HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2019-04-23SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2019-04-22HouseRepresentative Carbaugh added as conferee
2019-04-22HouseRepresentative Pierce removed as conferee
2019-04-22HouseRepresentative Carbaugh removed as advisor
2019-04-22SenateSenator Koch added as conferee
2019-04-22SenateSenator Stoops removed as conferee
2019-04-22SenateSenator Koch removed as advisor
2019-04-18SenateSenate advisors appointed: Koch, Tallian and Brown L
2019-04-18SenateSenate conferees appointed: Buck and Stoops
2019-04-17HouseHouse advisors appointed: Carbaugh, Morris, Frye R, Mayfield and Beck
2019-04-17HouseHouse conferees appointed: Ellington and Pierce
2019-04-17SenateSenator Koch added as third author
2019-04-17SenateSenator Koch removed as coauthor
2019-04-16SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2019-04-16SenateMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-16SenateConcurrence withdrawn
2019-04-15SenateMotion to concur filed
2019-04-15SenateSenator Tallian removed as third author
2019-04-11SenateSenator Koch added as coauthor
2019-04-11HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-04-09HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 451: yeas 61, nays 33
2019-04-04HouseAmendment #1 (Pierce) failed; voice vote
2019-04-04HouseAmendment #2 (Pierce) ruled out of order
2019-04-04HouseAmendment #3 (Carbaugh) failed; voice vote
2019-04-04HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-02HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-04-01HouseRepresentative Ellington added as sponsor
2019-04-01HouseRepresentative Mahan removed as sponsor
2019-03-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2019-02-06SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-05SenateCosponsor: Representative VanNatter
2019-02-05SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Mahan
2019-02-05SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 87: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-02-04SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-31SenateSenator Tallian added as third author
2019-01-31SenateSenator Boots added as second author
2019-01-31SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-15SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2019-01-15SenateAuthored by Senator Buck

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/603/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/2/2/03222894/SB0603.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/6/9/786956a4/SB0603.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/d/8/c8d8bc92/SB0603.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/d/0/dfd0bd73/SB0603.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/a/a/73aa13b0/SB0603.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/4/4/16443615/SB0603.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/f/6/05f6ebdf/SB0603.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/7/4/e/974e9719/SB0603.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/2/1/c821aadd/SB0603.87.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/9/5/b3954fef/SB0603.02.COMS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/6/2/3262bce2/SB0603.409.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/9/5/0595b05d/SB0603.451.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/7/9/3/1793c50a/SB0603.580.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/9/3/f0934df1/SB0603.613.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback