IN SB0582 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 199
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Hospital police departments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospital police departments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-23 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House - Amendment 2 (Lawson), prevailed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 199
2013-05-07SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-25HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-23HouseConference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 571: yeas 89, nays 10
2013-04-23HouseRules suspended
2013-04-23SenateConference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 507: yeas 43, nays 7
2013-04-11HouseHouse advisors appointed: Price and GiaQuinta
2013-04-11HouseHouse conferees appointed: Heuer and Lawson
2013-04-09SenateSenate advisors appointed: Crider, Breaux and M. Young
2013-04-09SenateSenate conferee appointed: Kruse and Arnold
2013-04-09SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2013-03-21HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2013-03-21HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 315: yeas 84, nays 8
2013-03-19HouseAmendment 2 (Lawson), prevailed; Roll Call 286: yeas 96, nays 0
2013-03-19HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-03-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2013-02-11SenateSenator Crider added as coauthor
2013-02-11SenateCosponsors: Reps. Morris, GiaQuinta and Smaltz
2013-02-11SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Heuer
2013-02-11SenateReferred to the House
2013-02-11SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 100: yeas 29 and nays 18
2013-02-07SenateSenator Arnold added as second author
2013-02-07SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-02-05SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-01-15SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation and Veterans Affairs
2013-01-15SenateAuthored by Senator Kruse

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2013&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SB&docno=0582
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/IN/IN0582.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/SB/SB0582.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/ES/ES0582.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/ES/ES0582.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/SE/SE0582.1.html
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0100.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0286.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0315.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0507.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0571.PDF.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback