IN SB0516 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Public Law 190
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Regulation of hemp. Establishes the Indiana hemp advisory committee (committee) to provide advice to the office of the state seed commissioner (commissioner) regarding Indiana's hemp laws. Sunsets the committee on July 1, 2021. Prohibits the commissioner from regulating a hemp product. Changes references from "industrial hemp" to "hemp" and amends the definition of hemp. Adds a definition of "hemp product". Allows for aerial inspection of hemp crops. Removes the limitation on the number of inspections that the state police department may conduct on a licensed hemp operation. Allows the commissioner to perform a criminal background check of an applicant for

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulation of hemp. Establishes the Indiana hemp advisory committee (committee) to provide advice to the office of the state seed commissioner (commissioner) regarding Indiana's hemp laws. Sunsets the committee on July 1, 2021. Prohibits the commissioner from regulating a hemp product. Changes references from "industrial hemp" to "hemp" and amends the definition of hemp. Adds a definition of "hemp product". Allows for aerial inspection of hemp crops. Removes the limitation on the number of inspections that the state police department may conduct on a licensed hemp operation. Allows the commissioner to perform a criminal background check of an applicant for

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 85 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenatePublic Law 190
2019-05-02SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-24HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 627: yeas 94, nays 3
2019-04-24SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 591: yeas 39, nays 9
2019-04-23HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2019-04-23SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2019-04-15HouseHouse advisors appointed: Lehe, Prescott, Baird, Lucas, Heine, Goodin and Wright
2019-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Eberhart and Klinker
2019-04-11SenateSenate advisors appointed: Doriot, Ford J.D., Perfect and Niezgodski
2019-04-11SenateSenate conferees appointed: Head and Tallian
2019-04-11SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2019-04-11SenateMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-11HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-04-09HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 450: yeas 85, nays 10
2019-04-08HouseAmendment #4 (Lucas) prevailed; Division of the House: yeas 49, nays 47
2019-04-08HouseAmendment #2 (Eberhart) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-08HouseAmendment #1 (Eberhart) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-08HouseAmendment #3 (Lehe) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-08HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-05HouseRepresentative Klinker added as cosponsor
2019-03-05HouseRepresentative Lehe removed as cosponsor
2019-03-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
2019-02-26SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-25SenateCosponsors: Representatives Lehe, Karickhoff and Manning
2019-02-25SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Eberhart
2019-02-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 196: yeas 47, nays 1
2019-02-21SenateSenator Raatz added as coauthor
2019-02-21SenateAmendment #2 (Head) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-21SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-04SenateSenator Bohacek added as coauthor
2019-01-31SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-01-31SenateSenator Spartz added as coauthor
2019-01-28SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2019-01-28SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-24SenateSenator Glick added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateSenator Buck added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateSenator Perfect added as third author
2019-01-14SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
2019-01-14SenateSenator Doriot added as second author
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Head

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/516/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/e/d/e/2ede176d/SB0516.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/8/c/0/e8c06133/SB0516.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/6/6/6a665fa8/SB0516.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/4/4/d/944d07c1/SB0516.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/4/9/36493164/SB0516.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/1/9/b51975cf/SB0516.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/b/b/eebb29fe/SB0516.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/3/0/5/6305e0db/SB0516.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/2/0/0/72002891/SB0516.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/c/c/32cc6891/SB0516.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/9/8/d6981537/SB0516.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/7/2/e/472e9988/SB0516.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/9/b/7b9b9483/SB0516.196.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/d/3/dcd38b75/SB0516.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/0/c/460c1d59/SB0516.450.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/a/6/d/2a6d982f/SB0516.627.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/e/c/a7ecdca3/SB0516.591.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback