IN SB0479 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Second reading: ordered engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Transfer of state real property. Requires the conveyance of certain real property by the state to the University of Evansville to remove restrictions on use of the property by the university that were required by legislation enacted in 1988 and 1997.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transfer of state real property. Requires the conveyance of certain real property by the state to the University of Evansville to remove restrictions on use of the property by the university that were required by legislation enacted in 1988 and 1997.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-14HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-03-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-02-06SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-04SenateCosponsors: Representatives Hatfield and McNamara
2019-02-04SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Sullivan
2019-02-04SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 69: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-01-31SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-28SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senators Becker, Tomes and Messmer

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback