IN SB0463 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals or otherwise removes all provisions that establish a mandatory retirement age for superior court and county court judges. Makes conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mandatory retirement age for trial court judges.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-28 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 79 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 161
2011-05-10 Signed by the Governor
2011-05-04 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-29 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-29 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-28 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 488: yeas 39, nays 11
2011-04-28 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 692: yeas 88, nays 5
2011-04-28 Rules suspended
2011-04-27 Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House
2011-04-21 House advisors appointed: Burton, Foley and Pelath
2011-04-21 House conferees appointed: Kirchhofer and Crawford
2011-04-19 Senate advisors appointed: Bray, Broden and Glick
2011-04-19 Senate conferees appointed: Buck and Randolph
2011-04-19 Senate dissented from House amendments
2011-04-19 Concurrence withdrawn
2011-04-18 Motion to concur in House amendments filed
2011-04-14 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2011-04-14 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 534: yeas 79, nays 16
2011-04-13 Amendment 2 (Leonard), withdrawn
2011-04-13 Amendment 1 (Burton), prevailed; voice vote
2011-04-13 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2011-04-11 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2011-02-17 Cosponsors: Reps. Foley, Turner and VanNatter
2011-02-17 House sponsor: Rep. Karickhoff
2011-02-17 Referred to the House
2011-02-17 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 153: yeas 43, nays 7
2011-02-15 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-02-14 Senator Randolph added as coauthor
2011-02-14 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-01-20 Senator Glick added as coauthor
2011-01-20 Senator Steele added as third author
2011-01-20 Senator Bray added as second author
2011-01-13 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2011-01-13 Authored by Senator Buck

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback