IN SB0461 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - SECTIONS 17 through 30 effective retroactive to 09/23/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that a resident may not be required to purchase a health plan. Requires the office of the secretary of family and social services and the department of insurance to investigate, and allows submission of a waiver for, a specified provision of the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (Act). Allows the office of Medicaid policy and planning (office) to request federal approval to change how the state determines Medicaid eligibility for the aged, blind, and disabled. Requires the Indiana check up plan (plan) to include any federally required bench mark services. Allows, instead of requires, the plan to include dental and vision services. Makes the following changes concerning the plan beginning January 1, 2014: (1) changes income eligibility requirements for the plan from 200% to 133%; and (2) removes the requirement that the individual's employer not provide health insurance and that the individual be without health insurance for six months. Allows a nonprofit organization and health insurers to make deposits into a plan participant's account under specified circumstances. Requires a plan participant to contribute at least $160 per year. Requires a health insurer that provides coverage under the plan until December 31, 2013, to also offer to provide coverage to certain other individuals in a manner consistent with federal law concerning underwriting, rating, and with state approval of the rate. Allows the office to amend the plan in a manner to be used to cover individuals eligible for Medicaid resulting from passage of the Act. Amends current health insurance law to specify application of the law in conformity with the Act, including provisions concerning coverage of children until age 26, grievances, and rescissions. Requires the office to apply to amend the Medicaid state plan to extend Medicaid coverage of family planning services for certain women and men. Makes conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal health care matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-29 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 28 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 65 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House - Amendment 1 (C. Brown), prevailed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House - Amendment 2 (C. Brown), failed (Y: 36 N: 60 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - House - House - Amendment 3 (Day), failed (Y: 36 N: 59 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 2 (Miller), prevailed (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 SECTIONS 17 through 30 effective retroactive to 09/23/2010
2011-05-18 SECTION 16 effective 05/10/2011
2011-05-18 SECTIONS 4 through 15 effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-18 SECTIONS 1 through 3 effective 05/10/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 160
2011-05-10 Signed by the Governor
2011-05-05 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-05-05 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-05-05 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-29 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 728: yeas 61, nays 35
2011-04-29 Rules suspended
2011-04-29 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 517: yeas 28, nays 21
2011-04-29 Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House
2011-04-18 House advisors appointed: Lehman, Davisson and Welch
2011-04-18 House conferees appointed: T. Brown and C. Brown
2011-04-14 Senate advisors appointed: Breaux and Lawson
2011-04-14 Senate conferees appointed: Miller and Simpson
2011-04-14 Senate dissented from House amendments
2011-04-13 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2011-04-13 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 524: yeas 65, nays 31
2011-04-12 Amendment 1 (C. Brown), prevailed; Roll Call 468: yeas 93, nays 0
2011-04-12 Amendment 2 (C. Brown), failed; Roll Call 467: yeas 36, nays 60
2011-04-12 Amendment 3 (Day), failed; Roll Call 466: yeas 36, nays 59
2011-04-12 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2011-04-07 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-04-05 Representative Welch added as cosponsor
2011-03-30 Representative Lehman added as cosponsor
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2011-02-03 Cosponsor: Rep. C. Brown
2011-02-03 House sponsor: Rep. T. Brown
2011-02-03 Referred to the House
2011-02-03 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 69: yeas 40 and nays 8
2011-01-25 Amendment 3 (Breaux), failed; voice vote
2011-01-25 Amendment 2 (Miller), prevailed; Roll Call 27: yeas 34, nays 13
2011-01-25 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2011-01-20 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-01-18 Senator Simpson added as third author
2011-01-18 Senator Lawson added as second author
2011-01-12 First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2011-01-12 Authored by Senator Miller

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2011&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SB&docno=0461
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/IN/IN0461.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/SB/SB0461.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/SB/SB0461.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/ES/ES0461.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/ES/ES0461.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/SE/SE0461.1.html
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Srollcal/0027.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Srollcal/0069.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Hrollcal/0466.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Hrollcal/0467.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Hrollcal/0468.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Hrollcal/0524.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Srollcal/0517.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/PDF/Hrollcal/0728.PDF.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback