IN SB0434 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - Committee report: do pass, adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - Committee report: do pass, adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Study committee. Urges the legislative council to assign to the education interim study committee the task of studying: (1) the current regulatory framework and methods to streamline regulatory compliance; and (2) the use of innovative solutions and public-private partnerships in delivering educational services and sharing of best practices.
Title
Study committee. Urges the legislative council to assign to the education interim study committee the task of studying: (1) the current regulatory framework and methods to streamline regulatory compliance; and (2) the use of innovative solutions and public-private partnerships in delivering educational services and sharing of best practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senator Melton added as coauthor |
2018-01-30 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Cook |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 115: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Spartz |