IN SB0426 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 167
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Public Law 167
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
County and township assessor qualifications. Removes requirements that a candidate for county or township assessor must attain a certain level assessor-appraiser certification as a condition for becoming a candidate for the office. Provides that an individual who has never held the assessor's office must have a level two assessor-appraiser certification before the individual assumes the office of assessor (county or township). Provides that an individual who has held the assessor's office must have a level three assessor-appraiser certification before the individual assumes a new term of office (county or township). Requires a county fiscal body to establish a salary schedule
Title
County and township assessor qualifications. Removes requirements that a candidate for county or township assessor must attain a certain level assessor-appraiser certification as a condition for becoming a candidate for the office. Provides that an individual who has never held the assessor's office must have a level two assessor-appraiser certification before the individual assumes the office of assessor (county or township). Provides that an individual who has held the assessor's office must have a level three assessor-appraiser certification before the individual assumes a new term of office (county or township). Requires a county fiscal body to establish a salary schedule
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Houchin [R] | Sen. Howard Kenley [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] |
Rep. Randy Truitt [R] | Rep. Robert Cherry [R] | Rep. Terry Goodin [D] | Rep. Rhonda Rhoads [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - House Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - House Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Senate | Public Law 167 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 519: yeas 41, nays 7 |
2015-04-27 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 544: yeas 68, nays 25 |
2015-04-14 | House | House Advisors appointed: Smith M, Saunders, Goodin and Kersey |
2015-04-14 | House | House Conferees appointed: Truitt and Pryor |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Advisors appointed: Kenley, Breaux and Buck |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Houchin and Broden |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2015-04-10 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2015-04-09 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 389: yeas 85, nays 9 |
2015-03-31 | House | Amendment #1 (Truitt) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-03-31 | House | Amendment #2 (Smith M) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-03-31 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-05 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Representatives Cherry, Goodin, Rhoads added as cosponsors |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Representative Truitt added as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 249: yeas 47, nays 3 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senator Ford added as coauthor |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Houchin) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senator Buck added as third author |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Senator Kenley added as second author |
2015-01-12 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator Houchin |