IN SB0423 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-13 - Public Law 248
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Property tax issues. Provides that, following a petition for review contesting the assessed value of tangible property, a taxpayer and a township or county official may enter into an agreement in which both parties: (1) agree to waive a determination by the county property tax assessment board of appeals (PTABOA) and submit a dispute directly to the Indiana board of tax review; or (2) agree to stipulate to the assessed value of the tangible property as determined by an independent appraisal. Provides certain provisions that must be included in an agreement, including provisions for selecting an independent appraiser. Specifies that

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property tax issues. Provides that, following a petition for review contesting the assessed value of tangible property, a taxpayer and a township or county official may enter into an agreement in which both parties: (1) agree to waive a determination by the county property tax assessment board of appeals (PTABOA) and submit a dispute directly to the Indiana board of tax review; or (2) agree to stipulate to the assessed value of the tangible property as determined by an independent appraisal. Provides certain provisions that must be included in an agreement, including provisions for selecting an independent appraiser. Specifies that

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-13SenatePublic Law 248
2015-05-06SenateSigned by the Governor
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-05-01HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-28SenateSenate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 515: yeas 49, nays 0
2015-04-27SenateMotion to concur filed
2015-04-27SenateDissent withdrawn
2015-04-16HouseHouse Advisors appointed: Schaibley, Huston and DeLaney
2015-04-16HouseHouse Conferees appointed: Leonard and Goodin
2015-04-14SenateSenate Advisors appointed: Houchin, Breaux and Ford
2015-04-14SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Kenley and Broden
2015-04-14SenateMotion to dissent filed
2015-04-14SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2015-04-10HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2015-04-09HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 388: yeas 95, nays 0
2015-04-07HouseRepresentative Schaibley added as cosponsor
2015-04-07HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-04-02HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-03-03HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2015-02-06SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-03SenateRepresentatives Huston and Goodin added as cosponsors
2015-02-03SenateRepresentative Leonard added as sponsor
2015-02-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 84: yeas 49, nays 1
2015-02-02SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-01-29SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-27SenateSenator Broden added as coauthor
2015-01-12SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
2015-01-12SenateAuthored by Senators Kenley and Houchin

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/senate/423/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/8/3/0283e1a5/SB0423.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/3/c/6/33c6fda1/SB0423.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/a/1/e3a1452f/SB0423.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/7/4/a7740f7f/SB0423.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/d/1/b9d1b3c9/SB0423.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/0/7/b107521d/SB0423.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/5/c/6/45c63de7/SB0423.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/a/2/3ca24150/SB0423.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/d/8/82d8fa4f/SB0423.84.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/8/7/0/a8706cf6/SB0423.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/5/0/6450c0b1/SB0423.388.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/b/9/7/fb97561f/SB0423.515.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback