IN SB0422 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Public Law 66
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Public Law 66
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the attorney general to establish and maintain a tax sale blight registry of all persons ineligible to participate in the tax sale. Provides that properties certified as vacant or abandoned may be sold outright at the tax sale. Reduces the interest rate for payments in excess of a minimum bid from 10% to 5%. Lowers the interest rate for refunds on certain tax sales from 6% to 5%. Provides that the notice to a record owner of property must occur six months, instead of nine months, after the date of the tax sale. Requires the executive of a county, city, or town to obtain a judgment that a parcel of real property is vacant or abandoned before a certification can be made to the county auditor for tax sales purposes. Reduces the period from six to three months when a tax sale purchaser may petition the court for a judgment directing the county auditor to issue a tax deed if the real property is not redeemed from the sale. Specifies that a property tax penalty for property sold by a county executive through a certificate of sale procedure is to be removed from the tax duplicate if the penalty is associated with a delinquency that was not due until after the date of the original tax sale but is due before the issuance of the certificate of sale by the county executive. Requires, for tax deeds executed for real property sold at a tax sale, that the county auditor submit the tax deed directly to the county recorder for recording and charge the tax sale purchaser the appropriate recording fee. Permits the county auditor to be the only signer of a sales disclosure form. Adds the term "blighted" in determining whether a building is an unsafe building. Requires a business entity that seeks to register to bid at a tax sale to provide a certificate from the secretary of state to the
Title
Abandoned housing.
Sponsors
Sen. James Merritt [R] | Sen. Randall Head [R] | Sen. Allen Paul [R] | Sen. Brent Waltz [R] |
Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Sen. Thomas Wyss [R] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Rep. Justin Moed [D] |
Rep. Richard Hamm [R] | Rep. Dan Forestal [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Concur in House Amendments (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Floor - (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Roll Call 042202 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Roll Call 042201 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Floor - (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Roll Call 042202 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Roll Call 042201 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Senate | Public Law 66 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Motion to Concur in House Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 390: yeas 45 and nays 0 |
2014-03-03 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2014-03-03 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 381: yeas 97 and nays 0 |
2014-02-27 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-02-27 | House | SB 422 Amendment #5 (Moed), prevailed. |
2014-02-27 | House | SB 422 Amendment #3 (Macer), failed. |
2014-02-27 | House | SB 422 Amendment #2 (Clere), prevailed. |
2014-02-25 | House | Representative Forestal added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Government and Regulatory Reform |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Hamm added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Moed added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Clere added as sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 195: yeas 47 and nays 1 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senator Steele added as coauthor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senator Paul added as third author. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senator Wyss added as coauthor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senator Waltz added as coauthor. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senator Head added as second author. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Local Government |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Merritt. |